+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018
- Arrive in Senate
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita