+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 16, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0200
- Effective Date August 16, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2007
- Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 14, 2007
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frank J. Mautino
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carolyn H. Krause
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas Holbrook
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond
- Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 019-000-000
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2007: HB0517 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 22, 2007
March 8, 2007: HB0517 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 08, 2007
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor