+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee; 008-000-000
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee; 011-000-000
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Removes language providing that a resulting company shall only be liable for the liabilities allocated to it in accordance with the plan of division and certain provisions and shall not be liable for any other liabilities under the common law doctrine of successor liability or a similar theory of liability applicable to transferees or assignees of property.
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- 215 ILCS 5/Art. IIB heading new -
- 215 ILCS 5/35B-1 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/35B-5 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/35B-10 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/35B-15 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/35B-20 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/35B-25 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/35B-30 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/35B-35 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/35B-40 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/35B-45 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/35B-50 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/156 - from Ch. 73, par. 768