+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On May 15, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-025-003
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Prevails
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr.
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 055-059-000
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
House Committee Amendment No. 2
Makes changes to certain dates in the introduced bill. Changes the effective date to July 1, 2008.
House Committee Amendment No. 2
Makes changes to certain dates in the introduced bill. Changes the effective date to July 1, 2008.
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 2705/2705-200 - was 20 ILCS 2705/49.16
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2008: HB5152 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 15, 2008
April 16, 2008: HB5152 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 16, 2008
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor