+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 605/605-10 - was 20 ILCS 605/46.1 in part
+ − Vote
March 27, 2019: HB0515 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor