+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook