+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
+ − Statute Amended
- 520 ILCS 5/1.1 - from Ch. 61, par. 1.1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor