+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0769
- Effective Date August 10, 2018
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2018
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2018
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 014-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Further amends the Illinois Pension Code. In the State Universities Article, provides that the System shall offer a defined contribution benefit to active members of the System. Provides that the defined contribution benefit shall collect optional employee and optional employer contributions into an account and shall offer investment options to the participant. Provides that the defined contribution benefit shall be operated in full compliance with any applicable State and federal laws, and the System shall utilize generally accepted practices in creating and maintaining the benefit for the best interest of the participants. Authorizes the System to use funds from the employee and employer contributions to defray any and all costs of creating and maintaining the benefit. Requires the System to produce an annual report on the participation in the benefit and to make that report public. Excludes any benefit increase resulting from the change made by the amendatory Act from the definition of "new benefit increase". Effective immediately.