+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- To Civil Procedure Subcommittee
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 765 ILCS 605/18 - from Ch. 30, par. 318
- 765 ILCS 605/19 - from Ch. 30, par. 319