+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- To Property Tax Subcommittee
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor