+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick J Verschoore
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 55 ILCS 5/3-10009 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-10009
- 55 ILCS 5/3-11002 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-11002
- 55 ILCS 5/3-11003 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-11003
- 55 ILCS 5/3-11004 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-11004
- 55 ILCS 5/3-11006 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-11006
- 55 ILCS 5/3-11007 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-11007
- 55 ILCS 5/3-11009 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-11009
- 55 ILCS 5/3-11010 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-11010
- 55 ILCS 5/3-11011 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-11011
- 55 ILCS 5/3-11013 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-11013
- 55 ILCS 5/3-11018 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-11018
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor