+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Darren Bailey
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Darren Bailey
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor