+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Medicaid Reform, Family & Children Services Committee; 008-001-001
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Medicaid Reform, Family & Children Services Committee
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Eliminates language prohibiting the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, the Department of Human Services, the Department on Aging, or any other State agency from utilizing a third-party managed care organization or any other similar provider to administer or pay for any and all medical assistance benefits made available under the Social Security Act. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall not be prohibited from contracting with vendors to continue the operation of care or disease management programs that existed prior to December 31, 2009.
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 5/5-2 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor