+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1, from the Illinois Board of Higher Education.
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On March 31, 2008 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 014-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Higher Education Committee
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 1, 2008: HB5109 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 01, 2008
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor