+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 17, 2012 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0989
- Effective Date January 1, 2013
- Governor Approved
On June 22, 2012 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2012 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012
- Second Reading
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012
- Do Pass Insurance; 007-000-000
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-004-002
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-000-000
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
+ − Statute Amended
- 215 ILCS 110/17 - from Ch. 32, par. 690.17