+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (52)
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0224
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 9, 2019
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 116-000-000
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Collins
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Referred to Assignments
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-020-000
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-002-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Peter Mendez Act. Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that curriculum for probationary police officers curriculum shall also include specified instruction in trauma-informed responses designed to ensure the physical safety and well-being of a child of an arrested parent or immediate family member.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 730 ILCS 5/5-9-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-9-3
- 50 ILCS 705/7 - from Ch. 85, par. 507
+ − Votes (7)
May 30, 2019: SFA0003 - Concurrence
May 29, 2019: SFA0003 - Judiciary - Criminal
May 28, 2019: HB0051 - Third Reading
May 28, 2019: SFA0003 - Criminal Law
May 7, 2019: HB0051 - Criminal Law
March 19, 2019: HB0051 - Third Reading
February 13, 2019: HB0051 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor