+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On January 4, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1169
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 4, 2019
On December 27, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On November 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 28, 2018
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000
On November 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On November 14, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On November 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 008-000-000
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (5)
November 28, 2018: HB5093 - Third Reading
November 27, 2018: HB5093 - State Government
November 14, 2018: HB5093 - Third Reading
May 23, 2018: HFA0001 - Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT
April 11, 2018: HB5093 - Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor