+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/31-6 - from Ch. 38, par. 31-6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor