+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On August 29, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0950
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 29, 2008
On June 30, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr.
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Pensions and Investments; 009-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Garrett
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1,2
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 112-000-000
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Pensions and Investments; 006-000-001
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2008
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Pensions and Investments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Demuzio
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Pensions and Investments
On May 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2008
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2008
- Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 007-000-000
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
On April 3, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 010-003-000
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
In provisions amending the State Finance Act, changes the fiscal year in which the State Treasurer shall apportion the amounts deposited into the State Pensions Fund from the Unclaimed Property Trust Fund among the designated retirement systems from fiscal year 2010 to fiscal year 2011.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
In provisions amending the State Finance Act, changes the fiscal year in which the State Treasurer shall apportion the amounts deposited into the State Pensions Fund from the Unclaimed Property Trust Fund among the designated retirement systems from fiscal year 2010 to fiscal year 2011.
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 30 ILCS 105/8.12 - from Ch. 127, par. 144.12
- 40 ILCS 5/2-124 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 2-124
- 40 ILCS 5/14-131 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 14-131
- 40 ILCS 5/15-155 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 15-155
- 40 ILCS 5/16-158 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-158
- 40 ILCS 5/18-131 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 18-131
- 40 ILCS 15/1 -
- 765 ILCS 1025/18 - from Ch. 141, par. 118
+ − Votes (4)
May 31, 2008: HB5088 - Third Reading - Saturday, May 31, 2008
May 31, 2008: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Saturday, May 31, 2008
May 31, 2008: SFA0002 - Concurrence - Saturday, May 31, 2008
April 3, 2008: HB5088 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 03, 2008
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor