+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Medicaid Reform, Family & Children Services Committee; 008-000-000
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Medicaid Reform, Family & Children Services Committee
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor