+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 015-000-000
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock