+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Adam Brown
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Adam Brown
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 105/1 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor