+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 10, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0903
- Effective Date August 10, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 15, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On May 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2004
- Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 1, 2004
- Referred to Rules
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 016-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
+ − Statute Amended
- 205 ILCS 665/2 - from Ch. 17, par. 5302