+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 17, 2012 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0988
- Effective Date January 1, 2013
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2012 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2012 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2012
- Second Reading
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012
- Do Pass Judiciary; 006-000-000
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2012
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Adoption Act. Provides that nothing in the provisions added by the introduced bill stating that service of process need not be directed to a minor defendant under 14 years of age for whom a guardian ad litem has been or will be appointed is intended to override any provision of the Act which relates to information to which an adopted person is entitled under specified provisions of the Act.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 750 ILCS 50/7 - from Ch. 40, par. 1509
- 750 ILCS 50/10 - from Ch. 40, par. 1512