+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 9, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0699
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 9, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2004
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eileen Lyons
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Susana Mendoza
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 725 ILCS 5/110-14 - from Ch. 38, par. 110-14
- 730 ILCS 5/5-9-1.7 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-9-1.7
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2004: HB5061 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 11, 2004
March 25, 2004: HB5061 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor