+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/24-11 - from Ch. 122, par. 24-11
+ − Vote
February 16, 2022: HB5060 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor