+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/5-8A-4.1-5 new