+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (50)
- Session Sine Die
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Cullerton
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cullerton
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 11, 2011
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 30, 2010
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 008-005-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2010
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 6, 2010
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2010
- Re-assigned to Executive
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Postponed - Higher Education
- Postponed - Higher Education
- Assigned to Higher Education
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-013-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the University of Illinois Exercise of Functions and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that holdover appointees, temporary appointees, and acting appointees to offices requiring Senate confirmation may not continue in office longer than stated limited periods. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that holdover appointees, temporary appointees, and acting appointees to offices requiring Senate confirmation may not continue in office longer than stated limited periods. Effective immediately.