+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- To Civil Procedure Subcommittee
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
+ − Statute Amended
- 735 ILCS 5/2-108 - from Ch. 110, par. 2-108
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor