+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ronald A. Wait
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 5/203 - from Ch. 120, par. 2-203