+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2008
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2008
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2008
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 011-000-000
On May 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 108-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marlow H. Colvin
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 1, 2008: HB5038 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 01, 2008
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor