+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Insurance Committee; 011-008-001
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Remains in Insurance Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Insurance Committee; 010-007-000
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 5 ILCS 375/6.11 -
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1069.3 -
- 65 ILCS 5/10-4-2.3 -
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.19 new -
- 305 ILCS 5/5-16.8 -
- 410 ILCS 50/2.04 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 5402.04
- 410 ILCS 50/5 -
- 410 ILCS 50/5.1 new -
- 410 ILCS 50/5.2 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor