+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke