+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 022-000-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- New Act
- 105 ILCS 5/21B-30
- 105 ILCS 5/21B-35
+ − Vote
February 16, 2022: HB5032 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor