+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 50 ILCS 705/7 - from Ch. 85, par. 507
- 50 ILCS 705/8 - from Ch. 85, par. 508
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor