+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 066-039-000
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Natalie A. Manley
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor