+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-5 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-5
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-13 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor