+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Correctional Note Filed
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deborah L. Graham
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-1
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-1.1
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1.6 -
- 730 ILCS 5/5-5-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-5-3
+ − Vote
March 30, 2004: HB5016 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 30, 2004
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor