+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-001-000
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Rep. Meyer/Note Inapplicable; 106-001-000
- Balanced Budget Note Request is Inapplicable
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Approp-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-001-003
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Approp-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. James H. Meyer
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2008: HB5013 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 15, 2008
March 13, 2008: HB5013 - Motion - Thursday, March 13, 2008
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor