+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.62 - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.62
- 105 ILCS 5/27-9.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-9.1
- 105 ILCS 5/27-9.2 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-9.2
- 105 ILCS 110/3 -
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor