+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 55 ILCS 5/2-3001 - from Ch. 34, par. 2-3001
- 55 ILCS 5/6-31002 - from Ch. 34, par. 6-31002
- 65 ILCS 5/1-1-2 - from Ch. 24, par. 1-1-2
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor