+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Prohibits the sale, trade, or exchange of cats or dogs at flea markets (instead of flea markets, swap meets, roadside sales, or similar events). Defines "flea market". Provides exceptions to the definition of "flea market". Effective immediately.