+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 18, 2002 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor