+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 27, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0464
- Effective Date June 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 29, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 1, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
On May 30, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. James H. Meyer
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Dillard
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On May 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary Criminal Law
On May 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2007
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-000-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 5, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. James H. Meyer
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill. Provides that the conditions of parole, mandatory supervised release, probation, or supervision if the victim is (i) the spouse, brother, or sister of the accused; (ii) a descendant of the accused; (iii) a first or second cousin of the accused; or (iv) a step-child or adopted child of the accused may include that the offender refrain from communicating with or contacting, by means of the Internet with a person who is related to the accused and whom the accused reasonably believes to be under 18 years of age.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 730 ILCS 5/3-3-7 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-3-7
- 730 ILCS 5/5-6-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-6-3
- 730 ILCS 5/5-6-3.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-6-3.1
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2007: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Friday, June 01, 2007
May 29, 2007: HB0050 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 29, 2007
March 29, 2007: HB0050 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 29, 2007
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor