+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On August 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0447
- Effective Date August 23, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-000-000
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 012-000-000
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-001
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-001-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Removes language requiring the Department to ensure access to mental health services, create or expand home visiting programs for high-risk mothers, and expand efforts to provide universal home visiting to all mothers within 3 weeks of giving birth. Requires the Department to adopt rules to implement the provisions.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (7)
May 30, 2019: SFA0001 - Concurrence
May 27, 2019: SFA0001 - Health Care Availability & Access
May 23, 2019: HB0005 - Third Reading
May 21, 2019: SFA0001 - Public Health
May 1, 2019: HB0005 - Public Health
March 19, 2019: HB0005 - Third Reading
February 5, 2019: HB0005 - Health Care Availability & Access
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor