+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On January 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 18, 2010
- Arrive in Senate
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-049-000
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-004-002
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaShawn K. Ford
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Personnel Code. Provides that the Department of Central Management Services must, within 10 calendar days after the end of each month, post on its Internet website a list showing the total number of those taking competitive examinations for employment during that month and receiving a "superior", "A", or otherwise designated highest test result, together with a breakdown of that total number categorizing the number of applicants receiving that highest grade by race as follows: African American, Hispanic, Asian American, Native American, Caucasian, and Other. Provides that the list shall include only numbers and shall not identify individuals by name.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -