+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 22, 2010 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1184
- Effective Date July 22, 2010
- Governor Approved
On May 26, 2010 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010
- Second Reading
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2010
- Do Pass Transportation; 007-000-000
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2010
- Arrive in Senate
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David Reis
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. David Reis
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Vehicles & Safety Committee
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John A. Fritchey
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall terminate the driving privileges suspension of a person who failed to pay fines or penalties for standing, parking, compliance, or automated traffic law violations whenever the person has entered into a payment plan pursuant to which the municipality has agreed to terminate the suspension. Provides that Secretary of State shall suspend the driving privileges of a person who is more than 14 days in default of such a payment plan. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.