+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 13, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0939
- Effective Date August 13, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 18, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2004
- Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 009-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Biggins
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 120/11 - from Ch. 120, par. 450
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2004: HB4976 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 20, 2004
March 25, 2004: HB4976 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor