+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 12, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0712
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 9, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2004
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- Home Rule Note Filed
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 018-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 625 ILCS 5/6-103 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-103
- 625 ILCS 5/6-208 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-208
- 625 ILCS 5/11-501 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-501
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2004: HB4966 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 11, 2004
March 23, 2004: HB4966 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 23, 2004
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor