+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 12, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0921
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
On June 15, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 019-000-000
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes the definition of "informed consent." Removes references to informed consent. Provides, in the requirements of the surrogacy contract, that each of the gestational surrogate and the intended parent or parents shall have signed a written acknowledgement that he or she received information about the legal, financial, and contractual rights, expectations, penalties, and obligations of the surrogacy agreement.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- New Act -
- 750 ILCS 45/2.5 new -
- 750 ILCS 45/6 - from Ch. 40, par. 2506